GA SR314 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on the Benefits of Solar Energy in Georgia; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Study Committee on the Benefits of Solar Energy in Georgia; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2023-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback