GA SR307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Sexual Exploitation and Human Trafficking Joint Task Force; and for other purposes.
Title
Sexual Exploitation and Human Trafficking Joint Task Force; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #126 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |