GA SR296 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing Senator Lawrence (Bud) Stumbaugh and dedicating a bridge in his honor; and for other purposes.
Title
Senator Lawrence (Bud) Stumbaugh Bridge; DeKalb County; dedicate
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #106 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |