GA SR214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging state agencies and departments to publish or deliver their reports to the General Assembly by electronic means whenever possible; and for other purposes.
Title
State Agencies and Departments; publish their reports to the General Assembly by electronic means; urge
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |