GA SR194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Transferring Oversight of Developmental Disabilities to the Department of Community Health; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Transferring Oversight of Developmental Disabilities to the Department of Community Health; create
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #568 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |