GA SR133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Atlanta-region Transit Link "ATL" Authority to prioritize and encourage the use of technological innovation and the development of intelligent transportation systems; and for other purposes.
Title
Atlanta-region Transit Link "ATL" Authority; prioritize and encourage the use of technological innovation; urge
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |