GA SR1200 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Senate Study Committee on School Discipline; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate Study Committee on School Discipline; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #643 (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |