GA SB98 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to provide an exemption from the application of certain laws regarding the carrying and possession of firearms for persons possessing valid weapons carry licenses; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; provide exemption from application of certain laws for persons possessing valid weapons carry licenses; exceptions
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Mitch Seabaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #125 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |