GA SB75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 50 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Board of Veterinary Medicine, so as to provide for a professional health program for impaired veterinarians; to provide for definitions; to provide for confidentiality of certain records; to provide for costs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Veterinary Medicine; professional health program for impaired veterinarians; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #307 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #296 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #39 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V9
2019-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-20SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback