GA SB71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to revise the definition of "absentee elector"; to provide for reasons for voting by absentee ballot; to provide for certain exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections and Primaries; the definition of "absentee elector"; revise; reasons for voting by absentee ballot; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] | Sen. Sheila McNeill [R] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 213, Sb 241, Sr 100, Sb 62, Sb 69, Sb 71, Sb 72: Senate Vote #155 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |