GA SB67 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Committee on Election Integrity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the submission of identification in connection with absentee ballot applications; to provide for the submission of photocopies of voter identification documents for absentee ballot applications; to provide for requesting of absentee ballot applications through a web portal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections and Primaries; submission of identification in connection with absentee ballot applications; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #61 (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 40, Sb 67, Sb 184, & Sb 188: Senate Vote #60 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-23SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-01SenateSenate Hopper
2021-02-01SenateSenate Insists and Appoints Conference Committee

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback