GA SB612 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Stockbridge, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4359), as amended, so as to change the corporate limits of such municipality; to provide for city council districts; to provide definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuance in office for current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Stockbridge; corporate limits of such municipality; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #815 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #771 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #609 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #771 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #609 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 705 | |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2022-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |