GA SB601 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to provide for the establishment of promise scholarship accounts to be funded by the state in the amount of $6,000.00 per school year for each participating student, subject to appropriations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Georgia Educational Freedom Act'; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #636 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 48th: Senate Vote #635 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #634 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 42nd: Senate Vote #633 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #632 (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By The Senator From The 48th: Senate Vote #635 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #634 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 42nd: Senate Vote #633 (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #632 (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Hopper |