GA SB559 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Effective Date 2022-03-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Effective Date 2022-03-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Thomson, approved March 15, 1973 (Ga. L. 1973, p. 2132), as amended, particularly by an Act approved February 27, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 3828), so as to change the description of the election districts for the members of the city council; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of the current members; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Thomson; description of the election districts for the members of the city council; change
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #632 (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #578 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #578 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Effective Date 2022-03-22 | |
2022-03-22 | Act 580 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |