GA SB532 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions for insurance, so as to establish the Back the Blue Fund that distributes voluntary contributions made through motor vehicle insurance policies to increase the pay to or enhance the benefits of law enforcement officers in this state; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Back the Blue Fund; establish
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |