GA SB518 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to other state symbols, so as to change the state floral emblem to the Sweetbay Magnolia; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Symbols; state floral emblem to the Sweetbay Magnolia; change
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Sen. Billy Hickman [R] | Sen. Jason Esteves [D] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67159 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/224428 |