GA SB502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating and re-creating the City of Woodstock, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 4160), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 12, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5404), so as to change the corporate limits of the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Woodstock; corporate limits of the city; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #696 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-06-24 | House | House First Readers |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |