GA SB482 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the election of the members of the Paulding County Board of Education, approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2381), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4621), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of education; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuance in office of current members; to provide for effective dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Paulding County Board of Education; districts for election of members; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Local Calendar Immediately Transmit: House Vote #555 (Y: 98 N: 62 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #554 (Y: 100 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #507 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #554 (Y: 100 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #507 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 549 | |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-02-24 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |