GA SB48 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement and pensions, so as to correct typographical, stylistic, and other errors and omissions in Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated and in Acts of the General Assembly amending Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; to correct capitalization and spelling in Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; to provide for other matters relative to Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

O.C.G.A.; correct errors/omissions; Title 47

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #344 - Pass (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #39 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-30 Effective Date
2009-04-30 Act 92
2009-04-30 Senate Date Signed by Governor
2009-04-09 Senate Sent to Governor
2009-03-26 House Passed/Adopted
2009-03-26 House Third Readers
2009-03-05 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-02-18 House Second Readers
2009-02-17 House First Readers
2009-02-12 Senate Passed/Adopted
2009-02-12 Senate Third Read
2009-02-05 Senate Read Second Time
2009-02-04 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-01-27 Senate Read and Referred

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback