GA SB470 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 13 of Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licensing of mortgage lenders and mortgage brokers, so as to provide for different categories of felony convictions for purposes of investigations of mortgage loan originator applicants; to repeal certain provisions for denial or revocation of a license or registration due to certain felony convictions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mortgage Lenders and Brokers; different categories of felony convictions for purposes of investigations of mortgage loan originator applicants; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #777 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #640 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #640 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 796 | |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hopper |