GA SB460 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act known as the "Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority Act of 1965," approved March 10, 1965 (Ga. L. 1965, p. 2243), as amended, so as to provide for adoption of a logo and brand to include the term "ATL" by such Authority by a certain date; to remove a limitation on the amount of funds such Authority may receive from the state; to provide for the publishing of standards for bus service for a fiscal year; to provide for clarification on the responsible parties for debt in relation to the issuance of certain revenue bonds; to amend requirements for transportation services contracts between the Authority and a local government; to provide for related matters; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority Act of 1965"; adoption of a logo and brand to include the term "ATL" by such Authority by certain date; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #537 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |