GA SB445 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 407
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to highways, bridges, and ferries, so as to provide for standards for contracts entered into by the Department of Transportation; to provide for a contract bidding process and award procedure; to prohibit camping on portions of the state highway system or property owned by the department; to provide for a definition; to declare property used for camping purposes in violation of such prohibition as contraband; to provide for forfeiture of such property; to provide for applicability; to provide for a penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Transportation; standards for contracts; contract bidding process and award procedure; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #760 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #888 (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 22 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #778 (Y: 149 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #523 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #888 (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 22 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #778 (Y: 149 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #523 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 407 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |