GA SB440 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, so as to change the name of the Georgia Firefighter Standards and Training Council to the Georgia Firefighter Minimum Standards Council; to modify provisions of the Code consistent with the name change; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Firefighter Standards/Training Council; change name to Georgia Firefighter Minimum Standards Council
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Chapman [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. Donald Thomas [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 - Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Read and Referred |