GA SB439 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Barwick; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, powers and construction; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Barwick; provide a new charter; incorporation, boundaries, powers and construction
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #836 (Y: 151 N: 5 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #615 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 419 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |