GA SB431 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to forgery and fraudulent practices, so as to add medical identity fraud to the provisions relating to identity fraud; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Forgery and Fraudulent Practices; add medical identity fraud to the provisions relating to identity fraud; definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #835 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #833 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #782 - Passage (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #568 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #833 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - House Vote #782 - Passage (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #568 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 752 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read and Referred |