GA SB426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, so as to streamline the deployment of wireless broadband in the public rights of way; to enact the "Broadband Infrastructure Leads to Development (BILD) Act" to limit the ability of local governing authorities to prohibit, regulate, or charge for use of public rights of way under certain circumstances; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Broadband Infrastructure Leads to Development (BILD) Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #807 (Y: 143 N: 10 NV: 23 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |