GA SB412 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Hancock County and to provide for its powers and duties, approved April 20, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011, p. 3710), so as to change the manner of appointment of the board; to change the manner of selection of the chairperson; to provide for the continuation in office of the current members of the board; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hancock County; board of elections and registration; change the manner of appointment of the board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 397 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |