GA SB397 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Act 369
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Act 369
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a new Charter for the City of Locust Grove, Georgia, in the county of Henry, approved April 7, 1976 (Ga. L. 1976, p. 4426), as amended, to change the corporate limits of such city; to provide descriptions; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Locust Grove; corporate limits of such city; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #482 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #474 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Act 369 | |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-02-15 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |