GA SB394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 16, Article 1 of Chapter 15 of Title 45, and Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to kidnapping, false imprisonment, and related offenses, general provisions regarding the Attorney General, and medical assistance generally, respectively, so as to provide for authority of the Attorney General to investigate and prosecute certain crimes and offenses; to provide for definitions; to provide for authority of the Attorney General to employ peace officers for certain purposes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Attorney General; authority to investigate and prosecute certain crimes and offenses; provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #709 (Y: 102 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #522 (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 377 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-23 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-22 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-20 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |