GA SB379 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 5 of Article 3 of Chapter 12 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pawnbrokers, so as to provide for limitations regarding certain fees or taxes for pawnbroker transactions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pawnbrokers; provide limitations regarding certain fees or taxes; transactions
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Rep. Doug Stoner [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #599 - Passage As Amended (Y: 29 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred |