GA SB373 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 3 of Title 14 and Part 6 of Article 4 of Chapter 3 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to directors and officers of nonprofit corporations and directors and officers of electric membership corporations and foreign electric cooperatives, respectively, so as to change provisions relating to the responsibilities and standard of care of directors and officers of certain corporations; to clarify the ability of directors and officers to rely on other individuals in the performance of their duties; to provide for a rebuttable presumption when directors and officers are acting in good faith; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nonprofit Corporations; directors and officers of electric membership corporations and foreign electric cooperatives; provisions; change
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #794 (Y: 145 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #507 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #507 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 391 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |