GA SB372 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to funeral directors and establishments, embalmers, and crematories, so as to provide for a determination as to whether a dead body that has been submitted to a funeral director in charge of a crematory is that of a deceased veteran; to provide a short title; to provide for certain notifications; to allow access to certain veterans' organizations under certain circumstances to information about a deceased; to allow certain veterans' organizations under certain circumstances to make arrangements for the disposition of the cremated remains of a deceased veteran; to provide for immunity; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Disposition of Veterans' Cremated Remains Act"; provide for a determination; deceased veteran; certain notifications
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #835 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #715 - Passage (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #516 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #715 - Passage (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #529 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #516 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-01 | Act 704 | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-29 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-28 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Reconsidered Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Reconsidered | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Notice to Reconsider | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Read and Referred |