GA SB370 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the superior court clerk's term of office and training requirements, so as to change provisions relating to the sponsor of training requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior Courts; sponsor of training requirements; change provisions
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Mike Crane [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |