GA SB363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the time for opening and closing of the polls; to provide for the tabulation of advance voting ballots in the same manner as absentee votes under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections and Primaries; time for opening and closing of the polls; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #495 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |