GA SB354 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 32-7-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for abandonment of public roads and streets, so as to further declare the authority of counties and municipalities to remove roads and streets from their road and street systems when it is determined that removal is in the best public interest; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Roads; further declare authority of counties/municipalities to remove roads from their systems when removal is in best public interest
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Sen. Ralph Hudgens [R] | Sen. Dan Moody [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #589 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-24 | Act 443 | |
2010-05-24 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-26 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House First Readers | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Read and Referred |