GA SB353 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 444
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 444
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 15 of Title 25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of boilers and pressure vessels, so as to establish civil enforcement and penalty authority in the Safety Fire Commissioner for violations concerning the regulation of boilers and pressure vessels; to provide for conditions; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for authority to institute civil actions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Boilers and Pressure Vessels; violations concerning the regulation; civil enforcement and penalty authority in the Safety Fire Commissioner; establish
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Rep. Henry Howard [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #791 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #747 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #438 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #747 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #438 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Act 444 | |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-19 | House | House Postponed |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |