GA SB333 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Effective Date 2024-02-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Effective Date 2024-02-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Mulberry; to provide a charter; to provide effective dates and transitional provisions governing the transfer of various functions and responsibilities from Gwinnett County to the City of Mulberry; to provide for severability; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Mulberry; incorporate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #448 (Y: 101 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #462 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #461 (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #462 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #461 (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Effective Date 2024-02-13 | |
2024-02-13 | Act 358 | |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |