GA SB332 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hunting, trapping, or fishing, so as to provide for a hunter mentor program within the Department of Natural Resources; to provide for definitions; to provide for program criteria and terms and conditions; to provide for a special hunting passport for program participants; to provide for findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Natural Resources; hunter mentor program; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #871 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #825 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #444 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #825 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #444 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Act 478 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-27 | House | House Postponed |
2018-03-23 | House | House Postponed |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |