GA SB307 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to programs and protection for children and youth, so as to provide for registration of supportive housing maternity residences to provide housing for pregnant women; to define a term; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for the right to inspect; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to provide a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"The Living Hope Home Act"; related to supportive housing for pregnant women age 18 or older; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #518 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |