GA SB303 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Alpharetta ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Homestead Exemption; City of Alpharetta; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #399 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |