GA SB302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fiscal bills generally, so as to provide for independent economic analyses to be procured by the Office of Planning and Budget for certain tax benefits upon request by the chairpersons of the House Committee on Ways and Means and the Senate Finance Committee; to provide a short title; to provide for limits; to provide for summaries to be attached to related fiscal notes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Tax Credit Return on Investment Act of 2020"; independent economic analyses; provide; enact
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #477 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #481 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #481 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |