GA SB289 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to require students to take one course containing online learning; to provide for the online administration of end-of-course assessments; to require local school systems to provide opportunities for participation in part-time and full-time virtual instruction programs; to establish a list of providers; to provide requirements for providers; to provide for a report by the Department of Education on digital learning methods; to provide for blended learning courses in charter schools which include online instruction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; require students; one course containing online learning

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #867 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #756 - Passage (Y: 125 N: 38 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #505 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-01 Effective Date
2012-05-01 Act 708
2012-05-01 Senate Date Signed by Governor
2012-04-09 Senate Sent to Governor
2012-03-29 Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub
2012-03-26 House Passed/Adopted
2012-03-26 House Third Readers
2012-03-19 House Committee Favorably Reported
2012-02-27 House Second Readers
2012-02-24 House First Readers
2012-02-23 Senate Passed/Adopted
2012-02-23 Senate Third Read
2012-02-21 Senate Read Second Time
2012-02-17 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2011-04-14 Senate Read and Referred

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback