GA SB274 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Bartow County school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in the full amount of the first $400,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that school district who are 80 years of age or older; to provide that applicants have paid ad valorem property taxes in Bartow County for the previous five years; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bartow County; homestead exemption; school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #208 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |