GA SB250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 1 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Sexual Offender Registration Review Board, so as to require registration on the State Sexual Offender Registry when an individual is convicted in another country; to provide that the sentencing superior court judge shall make the risk assessment classification as part of sentencing for sexual offenders convicted in this state; to provide for recommendations by the Sexual Offender Registration Review Board to such sentencing judge; to provide for appeals; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Sexual Offender Registry; individual is convicted in another country; require registration
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #324 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #340 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #132 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #340 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #132 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 171 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |