GA SB242 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-34-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to delegation of certain medical acts to advanced practice registered nurses, so as to provide an exception to the number of advanced practice registered nurses with which a delegating physician can enter into a protocol agreement at any one time for nurses in certain locations under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses; delegating physician can enter into a protocol agreement at any one time for nurses; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #287 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #149 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #287 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #149 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 274 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |