GA SB242 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-42-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to powers of downtown development authorities generally, so as to provide that downtown development authorities may undertake projects regarding reducing energy or water consumption on property or installing an improvement to property that produces energy from renewable resources within the territorial boundaries of the municipality; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Downtown Development Authorities; undertake projects; reducing energy or water consumption; renewable resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #390 (Y: 165 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #151 (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #151 (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 231 | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |