GA SB232 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to require unique bar codes on individual absentee ballots; to revise provisions regarding the preparation and mailing of absentee ballot envelopes; to provide an oath for registrars and absentee ballot clerks opening and verifying absentee ballots; to require voters to provide a copy of certain forms of identification with their absentee ballots; to require a witness signature to the elector's oath on absentee ballots; to provide for a period for a voter to cure a defect related to the identification provided by the voter; to revise provisions regarding the opening, review, and verification of absentee ballots; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Primaries and Elections; unique bar codes on individual absentee ballots; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 74, Sb 93, Sb 141, Sb 178, Sb 202, Sb 232, Sb 199, Sb 253: Senate Vote #156 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |