GA SB225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prestige license plates and special plates for certain persons and vehicles, so as to provide for a veteran's license plate to individuals who served in the armed forces for an ally of the United States during active military combat; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
License Plates; individuals who served in the armed forces for an ally of the United States during active military combat; provide a veteran's license plate
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #368 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #319 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #182 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #319 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #182 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 145 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |