GA SB222 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state symbols, so as to designate the pecan as the official state nut; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Symbols; pecan as the official state nut; designate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #355 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 16th: Senate Vote #119 (Y: 5 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #120 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 16th: Senate Vote #119 (Y: 5 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #120 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-04-09 | Act 13 | |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |