GA SB222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 36, 45, and 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, public officers and employees, and public utilities and public transportation, respectively, so as to create the Local Government 9-1-1 Authority; to provide for members, powers, duties, authority, and responsibilities; to change certain provisions relating to the remittance of 9-1-1 charges; to provide for payment by service suppliers to the Local Government 9-1-1 Authority; to provide for administrative costs; to provide for legal representation; to provide for penalties and interest for noncompliance; to revise definitions relative to the Georgia Emergency Telephone Number 9-1-1 Service Act; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Local Government 9-1-1 Authority Act'; Local Government 9-1-1 Authority; create
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #380 (Y: 143 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #361 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #141 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #361 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #141 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Veto V9 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |